MA H1091 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4452

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further regulating transportation of charter school students. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to charter school transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-27HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4452
2011-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2011-01-24SenateSenate concurred
2011-01-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H4452 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback