MA H1088 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide full student representation on the University of Massachusetts Board of Trustees. Higher Education.
Title
Providing full student representation on the University of Massachusetts Board of Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4134 |
2013-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2013 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4134 (Replaced by) 2014-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1088 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1088.pdf |