MA H108 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a statewide neonatal and postnatal home parenting education and home visiting program for certain at-risk newborns. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote healthy families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-05HouseReported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback