MA H108 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4423
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include motor homes in the lemon law, so-called, protecting consumers from defective vehicles. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to motor home lemon law eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Sen. Gale Candaras [D] | Rep. Steven Levy [R] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4423 |
2011-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4423 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H108 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10458&generalCourtId=1 |