MA H1071 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to inpatient mental health care treatment. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To provide more timely treatment of inpatient mental health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-07-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S539 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1224 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4742 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2018
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S539 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1224 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4742 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1071 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1071.pdf |