MA H1070 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to racial balance in the charter school educational system in the Commonwealth. Education.
Title
For the further promotion of racial balance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2011-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4405 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1070 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12563&generalCourtId=1 |