MA H1055 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contracts for pharmacy services between health insurance carriers or pharmacy benefits' managers and pharmacies or pharmacists. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to pharmaceutical gag clauses
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S714 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1055 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1055.pdf |