MA H1046 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to homeowner's insurance coverage for the cleanup of accidental home heating oil spills. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cleanup of accidental home heating oil spills

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-29HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-04-29HouseRules suspended
2024-04-29HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-03-28HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S648 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2737
H957 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2737 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback