MA H1038 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide health care coverage by the Division of Medical Assistance for mandibular advancement splints in the treatment of obstructive sleep apnea. Health Care Financing.
Title
Providing health care coverage for mandibular advancement splints
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4234 |
2013-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4234 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H369
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1038 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1038.pdf |