MA H1032 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4510
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the composition of the citizens advisory committee for the former Northampton State Hospital. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to the composition of the citizens advisory committee for the former Northampton State Hospital
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4510 |
2014-10-23 | House | New draft substituted, see H4510 |
2014-10-23 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-10-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-10-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2014-10-23 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-10-23 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4510 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-15 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4510 (Replaced by) 2014-12-08 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4549
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1032 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1032.pdf |