MA H103 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4374
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to state benefits and assistance for certain children in homeless families. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Providing immediate childcare assistance to homeless families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4374 |
2019-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S67 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2667
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1265 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4374 (Replaced by) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1265 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4374 (Replaced by) 2020-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H103 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H103.pdf |