MA H1021 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide insurance coverage for the use of electronic tracking devices to protect the safety of persons with Autism spectrum disorder or Alzheimer’s disease. Financial Services.
Title
Concerning the safety of autistic and alzheimer individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H980 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1021 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1021.pdf |