MA H1021 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4635

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require the Department of Public Health to update regulations governing licensed health care facilities with requirements relative to the federal standards for accessible medical equipment. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to accessible medical equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4635
2015-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/01/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback