MA H102 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4473

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to farmer-distilleries. Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to farmer-distilleries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4473
2024-02-01JointHearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2024-01-31JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2024-01-30JointHearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-10JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2023-04-06SenateSenate concurred
2023-04-03HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H4473 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4625 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4709 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4136 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4658 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback