MA H102 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the monthly benefits for certain recipients of the aid to parents with dependent children and emergency aid programs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To reduce deep poverty among kids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
S91 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S36 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S38 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
H3594 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2019
S91 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S36 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S38 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
H3594 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H102 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H102.pdf |