MA H1016 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the ability of independent auto repair businesses to repair automobiles after the expiration of any warranty. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Resolve Special commission independent auto repair industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4362 |
2012-07-31 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, June 28, 2012 |
2012-05-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 17, 2012 |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 3, 2012 |
2011-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4362 (Replaced by) 2012-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1016 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12537&generalCourtId=1 |