MA H1015 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a study of the economic impact of the increased minimum wage. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to a study of the economic impact of the increased minimum wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-19 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1004 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H3152 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2365 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H4111 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2268 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H3152 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2365 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H4111 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2268 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1015 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1015.pdf |