MA H1013 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contracts for pharmacy services between health insurance carriers or pharmacy benefits' managers and pharmacies or pharmacists. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to pharmaceutical gag clauses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S652 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1013 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1013.pdf |