MA H1002 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4729

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include offsite fabrication work for qualified projects under the prevailing wage laws of the Commonwealth. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to compliance with the prevailing wage laws of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4729
2017-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2017-01-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S987 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H2375 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H2373 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2421 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2700 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H1264 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H27 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4329
H4093 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4441
S2268 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback