MA H1 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Reported, in part, by H3800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A message from His Excellency the Governor submitting the annual budget of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2019 (House, No. 1).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2020 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions, and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund, and serial bond requirements, and for certain permanent improvements

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseReported, in part, by H3800
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H74 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Reported, in part, by H3638
H485 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3220 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3505 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Published as amended, see H3506
H3506 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2019
S1476 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S310 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H497 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3638 (Similar To) 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2019
H816 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
H3800 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - See H3801
H3799 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - See H3800
H3801 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Committee of conference appointed (Rodrigues-Friedman-deMacedo), in concurrence
H3910 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback