LA SR81 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Legislative Workgroup on Electronic Prescribing to study and make recommendations concerning electronic prescribing.
Title
Creates the Legislative Workgroup on Electronic Prescribing to study and make recommendations concerning electronic prescribing.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-16 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. | |
2011-06-16 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-15 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |