LA SR77 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study and make recommendations on best practices for coordinating services for patients with cancer.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study and make recommendations on best practices for coordinating services for patients with cancer.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |