LA SR77 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaims June 7, 2011, as "Girl Scouts of the USA Day" at the Louisiana Senate.
Title
Proclaims June 7, 2011, as "Girl Scouts of the USA Day" at the Louisiana Senate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title and adopted. | |
2011-06-06 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |