LA SR45 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Zachary Evans Cryer of Benton Middle School for being named the 2020 Louisiana Middle School Student of the Year.
Title
Commends Zachary Evans Cryer of Benton Middle School for being named the 2020 Louisiana Middle School Student of the Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |