LA SR30 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/12/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/12/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends members of the Louisiana Automobile Dealers Association for their activities and contributions to the people of Louisiana and to designate Tuesday, April 9, 2024, as Louisiana Automobile Dealer Day at the state capitol.
Title
Commends members of the Louisiana Automobile Dealers Association for their activities and contributions to the people of Louisiana and to designate Tuesday, April 9, 2024, as Louisiana Automobile Dealer Day at the state capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/12/2024. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |