LA SR29 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the state Department of Education to study the education and training requirements, compensation, and employment turnover rates of early childhood care and education teachers.
Title
Requests the state Department of Education to study the education and training requirements, compensation, and employment turnover rates of early childhood care and education teachers.
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |