LA SR25 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes March 21, 2018, as Stop the Bleed Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Recognizes March 21, 2018, as Stop the Bleed Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |