LA SR196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. Dawn Harris Jeffries on becoming the new president and CEO of the Tri-County (Peoria) Urban League.
Title
Commends Dr. Dawn Harris Jeffries on becoming the new president and CEO of the Tri-County (Peoria) Urban League.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |