LA SR192 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Lafayette Economic Development Authority to develop and implement a comprehensive economic development strategic plan for the northern part of the city of Lafayette.
Title
Requests the Lafayette Economic Development Authority to develop and implement a comprehensive economic development strategic plan for the northern part of the city of Lafayette.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |