LA SR182 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Scott Wester for his many years of dedicated, faithful service to the Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System and the state of Louisiana.
Title
Commends Scott Wester for his many years of dedicated, faithful service to the Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System and the state of Louisiana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |