LA SR180 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to conduct a fiscal impact study prior to making a determination relative to a Type 2 charter school proposal.
Title
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to conduct a fiscal impact study prior to making a determination relative to a Type 2 charter school proposal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |