LA SR177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Access to Broadband High-Speed Internet Service.
Title
Creates the Task Force on Access to Broadband High-Speed Internet Service.
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |