LA SR16 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates the adoption of the flag of the United States on June 14, 1777, and recognizes National Flag Week, June 14-20, 2020, in Louisiana.
Title
Commemorates the adoption of the flag of the United States on June 14, 1777, and recognizes National Flag Week, June 14-20, 2020, in Louisiana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |