LA SR156 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences to the loved ones of Mr. Wilfred E. Fruge Sr.
Title
Expresses condolences to the loved ones of Mr. Wilfred E. Fruge Sr.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |