LA SR151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study ways to increase early voting in Louisiana with an emphasis on rural communities.
Title
Creates a task force to study ways to increase early voting in Louisiana with an emphasis on rural communities.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |