LA SR146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Request the Louisiana Department of Education and the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to conduct a survey or study to determine school compliance with state law regarding vending machines and requirements for physical activity.
Title
Request the Louisiana Department of Education and the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to conduct a survey or study to determine school compliance with state law regarding vending machines and requirements for physical activity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-05-30 | Read by title and adopted. | |
2012-05-30 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-05-28 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-05-24 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |