LA SR14 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2021, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Title
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2021, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |