LA SR139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Tuesday, May 26, 2015, as National Federation of Independent Business/Louisiana Small Business Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Recognizes Tuesday, May 26, 2015, as National Federation of Independent Business/Louisiana Small Business Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |