LA SR123 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Lower Pearl River Basin Ecosystem Study Commission.
Title
Re-creates the Lower Pearl River Basin Ecosystem Study Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |