LA SR106 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association and designates Tuesday, April 17, 2018, as Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association and designates Tuesday, April 17, 2018, as Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |