LA SR100 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests police juries to include representatives of the nursing profession on hospital service district commissions.
Title
Requests police juries to include representatives of the nursing profession on hospital service district commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |