LA SR100 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Law Institute to study and make recommendations relative to certain collateral consequences faced by persons with criminal records.
Title
Requests the Law Institute to study and make recommendations relative to certain collateral consequences faced by persons with criminal records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |