LA SCR90 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Doug Ireland upon his retirement as the sports information director for Northwestern State University of Louisiana.
Title
Commends Doug Ireland upon his retirement as the sports information director for Northwestern State University of Louisiana.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] | Rep. Terry Brown [I] | Rep. Kenny Cox [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 90 ADOPT (#261) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-05-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |