LA SCR82 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge and request the Louisiana Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to perform a study determining how local governing authorities can regulate air boat noise pollution.
Title
To urge and request the Louisiana Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to perform a study determining how local governing authorities can regulate air boat noise pollution.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 82 ADOPT (#539) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2013-05-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |