LA SCR78 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests joint study of the appropriate use of campaign funds and the administration and enforcement of laws within the jurisdiction of the Board of Ethics.
Title
Requests joint study of the appropriate use of campaign funds and the administration and enforcement of laws within the jurisdiction of the Board of Ethics.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Amedee [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 78 CONCUR (#997) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on SCR 78 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#807) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 78 ADOPT (#538) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on SCR 78 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#807) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 78 ADOPT (#538) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-29 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |