LA SCR74 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Sue Donohoe on receiving the 2017 Dave Dixon Louisiana Sports Leadership Award and being named to the 2017 Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame Induction Class.
Title
Commends Sue Donohoe on receiving the 2017 Dave Dixon Louisiana Sports Leadership Award and being named to the 2017 Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame Induction Class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 74 ADOPT (#236) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |