LA SCR74 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the first responders of Louisiana for their swift action to combat the Deepwater Horizon oil spill in the Gulf of Mexico.
Title
Commends the first responders of Louisiana for their swift action to combat the Deepwater Horizon oil spill in the Gulf of Mexico.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 74, ADOPT (#542) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-12 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-11 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-05-10 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |