LA SCR69 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the Apalachee Indians Talimali Band as an Indian tribe of the state.
Title
Recognizes the Apalachee Indians Talimali Band as an Indian tribe of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 ADOPT (#555) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 RECOMMIT (#554) (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 ADOPT (#553) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 RECOMMIT (#554) (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 69 ADOPT (#553) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |