LA SCR67 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Wildlife & Fisheries to formulate plans to prevent and limit the impact of certain wildlife diseases.
Title
Requests the Department of Wildlife & Fisheries to formulate plans to prevent and limit the impact of certain wildlife diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1659) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 CO-AUTHORS (#1058) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 ADOPT (#1057) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 CO-AUTHORS (#1058) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 ADOPT (#1057) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-06-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |