LA SCR66 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and designates Monday, May 8, 2017, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.
Title
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and designates Monday, May 8, 2017, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 66 ADOPT (#181) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-05-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |